HI SB2721 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:00PM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:00PM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of health to implement the auditor's recommendations for the deposit beverage container program, including developing a risk-based selection process to select reports submitted by distributors and redemption centers for audit. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Deposit Beverage Container Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2020-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-17-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-03-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). |
2020-03-13 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1067-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2020-03-12 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane, Thielen. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-12-20 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN , referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 354) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3252) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-20 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from CPH/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2719) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Fevella. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Ruderman, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, L. Thielen, Fevella. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-20 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH/AEN, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Auditor Recommendations
Deposit Beverage Container Program
Distributors
Redemption Centers
Risk-Based Selection Process
Deposit Beverage Container Program
Distributors
Redemption Centers
Risk-Based Selection Process