HI SB2723 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3).
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3).
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires GoFarm Hawaii to provide the chairperson of the board of agriculture with an annual report of the program's goals and a semi-annual report outlining program outputs and outcomes. Establishes a five-year beginning farmer training program to be administered by the University of Hawaii West Oahu sustainable community food systems program. Appropriates funds for the GoFarm Hawaii program and the beginning farmer training program. Effective 7/1/2150. Repeals the beginning farmer training program on 6/30/2025. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). |
2020-03-13 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1030-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LHE. |
2020-03-11 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cabanilla Arakawa, Perruso, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Holt. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-11-20 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to AGR, LHE, FIN , referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 356) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3052) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-20 10:35AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from HRE/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2716) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-20 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HRE/AEN, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2568 (Same As) 2020-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2).
Subjects
Appropriations ($)
Beginning Farmer Training Program
Food Sustainability
GoFarm Hawaii
University of Hawaii
Beginning Farmer Training Program
Food Sustainability
GoFarm Hawaii
University of Hawaii