HI SB2724 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of lead-based paint on outdoor structures after 12/31/2021. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Lead-based Paint.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2020-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-16-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-03-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). |
2020-03-13 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1061-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2020-03-12 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Ward. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-12-20 9:00AM in House conference room Auditorium. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-03 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-02-28 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 44). |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-28-20. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2906) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-20-20 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPH. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2515) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPH. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-20 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to AEN, CPH. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |