HI SB273 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Act 243, 07/14/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1352).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Act 243, 07/14/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1352).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the examiner of drivers to accept a sworn statement from a victim services organization, an attorney, a member of the clergy, correctional institution staff, a medical or health professional, or a verification letter from a homeless service provider as documentary evidence of a homeless person's address. Requires the Director of Transportation's rules to direct the examiner of drivers to waive all fees for original or renewal identification cards for homeless individuals upon verification of homeless status. Establishes a working group to develop a plan to enable homeless individuals in the State to obtain necessary documentary evidence. (CD1)
Title
Identification Cards; Examiner of Drivers; Homeless; Sworn Statement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | Senate | Act 243, 07/14/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1352). |
2015-07-15 | House | Act 243, on 07/14/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1352). |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tsuji excused (1). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 123) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 123). |
2015-05-01 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Rhoads, Hashem, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Luke. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Keith-Agaran, Espero, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 3:30PM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-15 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-15 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-15 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Morikawa, Rhoads, Luke Co-Chairs; Hashem, Fukumoto Chang. |
2015-04-20 | House | Re-referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 54 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Chun Oakland Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Espero, Harimoto, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 498). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1539) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-02 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Kawakami. |
2015-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 04-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Har, Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1175) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-03-24 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Creagan, Hashem; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang. |
2015-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 03-24-15 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-03-19 | House | The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday 03-24-15 at 10:00am. |
2015-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 03-19-15 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 97) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 773) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-03-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 03-04-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Re-Referred to HSH, JDL. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to TRA. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 313) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to TRA. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HSH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-15 2:00PM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HSH, TRA. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |