HI SB2741 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes DHS to establish, or contract with a victim service provider to operate or manage, an emergency shelter for victims of sex trafficking, subject to available funding. Exempts compensation received by a victim service provider for operating a sex trafficking emergency shelter from the general excise tax. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Sex Trafficking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2807) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Ihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Fevella. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-20 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS, JDC/WAM. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM/HMS, JDC/WAM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HMS, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |