HI SB2758 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 4:00PM in conference room 016.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 4:00PM in conference room 016.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the interest and other moneys earned on the principal of the hurricane reserve trust fund to be deposited into the trust fund instead of being diverted to the general fund. Effective 12/21/2112. (HD1)
Title
Hurricane Reserve Trust Fund; Interest and Other Earnings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 4:00PM in conference room 016. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 9:45AM in conference room 016. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-14 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-16-14 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Luke Co-Chairs; Cachola, Hashem, McDermott Members. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Espero Co-Chair; Slom Member. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1533-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2014-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-27-14 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-21 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1215-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-19 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Creagan, Evans, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, Tsuji, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ito, McDermott. |
2014-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-19-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-17 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-19-14. |
2014-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-17-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-07 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 282) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2773) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kouchi. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-13-14 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2026) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |