HI SB2792 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Re-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 44
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Re-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 44
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires, without limitation, criminal history record checks of household members of a child whose family receives a child care subsidy from the Department of Human Services, clarifies that the Department of Human Services may take administrative and judicial action to enforce child care licensing provisions of chapter 346, Hawaii Revised Statutes, clarifies the role and response of the child care licensing program when it receives a report of death or injury of a child in a child care setting, and addresses the release of information pending an investigation. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Child Care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | Re-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 44 |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to HHS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 312) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2613) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Wakai. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-18 9:55AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-21-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2432) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Harimoto, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Wakai. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-18 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS, JDC/WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS/JDC, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2365 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - Referred to HHS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 9
Subjects
Criminal History Checks
Improve Safety of Children in Care
Penalties, Administrative and judicial action
Records of Deficiencies and Complaints
Release of Information for Purposes of Investigation
Role and Response to Reports of Death or Injury in a Child Care Setting
Improve Safety of Children in Care
Penalties, Administrative and judicial action
Records of Deficiencies and Complaints
Release of Information for Purposes of Investigation
Role and Response to Reports of Death or Injury in a Child Care Setting