HI SB2817 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 201, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 693).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 201, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 693).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires every private homeowners association or entity to revise rules by July 1, 2011, that shall not impose conditions or restrictions that render a solar energy device more than 25 per cent less effective; increase the cost of installation, maintenance, and removal of a solar energy device by more than 15 per cent; or until June 20, 2015, require an encumbrance on title because of the placement of the solar energy device. (CD1)
Title
Solar Energy Device; Homeowners Associations
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Bunda [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Norman Sakamoto [D] | Sen. Dwight Takamine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-07 | (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 201, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 693). | |
2010-07-07 | (H) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 201, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 455). | |
2010-05-03 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Deferred to Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-21 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-23-10. | |
2010-04-21 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-23-10. | |
2010-04-21 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 62-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-21 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 62-10). | |
2010-04-16 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Morita, Cabanilla, Karamatsu; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ching. | |
2010-04-16 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. | |
2010-04-14 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-16-10 2:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-04-13 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-14-10 3:00PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 557). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Morita, Cabanilla, Karamatsu Co-Chairs; Ching. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 496). | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 494). | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Gabbard, Chair; Baker, Co-Chair(s); Green. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 407). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hanohano excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1136-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-30 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Karamatsu, Ito, Belatti, Cabanilla, Herkes, McKelvey, Mizuno, Morita, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Wakai, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Carroll, Luke. | |
2010-03-29 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2010-03-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-30-10 2:30PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-03-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Ching, Manahan, Nishimoto excused (4). | |
2010-03-16 | (H) Reported from EEP/HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 754-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2010-03-11 | (H) The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chong, Chang, Coffman, Herkes, Luke, Morita, Sagum, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ito, C. Lee, Ching. | |
2010-03-11 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Morita, Coffman, Cabanilla, Chang, Chong, Herkes, Luke, Sagum, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ito, C. Lee, Ching. | |
2010-03-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/HSG on Thursday, 03-11-10 10:05AM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-03-05 | (H) This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-09-10 9:00AM in conference room 325. | |
2010-03-05 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-09-10 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Referred to EEP/HSG, JUD, referral sheet 37 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 281) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) One Day Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2517) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Espero, Green, Sakamoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-24-10 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2078) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Hooser, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Ihara, Kokubun. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-10 3:00pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to ENE, CPN. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |