HI SB2828 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, Matsumoto, McKelvey, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso, Wildberger voting no (2) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, Matsumoto, McKelvey, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso, Wildberger voting no (2) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies in the State Water Code that fire safety use is a beneficial use of fresh water. Requires the department of land and natural resources, in consultation with the Hawaii emergency management agency, to cooperate with the counties and reservoir owners to develop protocols and agreements for the use of reservoir waters for fire safety purposes. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Water.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, Matsumoto, McKelvey, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso, Wildberger voting no (2) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). |
2020-05-12 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1188-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-03-11 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Tarnas, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Lowen; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Wildberger; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-11-20 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 388) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3273) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-20 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from WTL/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2552) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-20 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WTL/PSM, JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2646 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, Okimoto, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).