HI SB2849 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 677).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 677).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts all appropriations by the legislature for contributions to the Hawaii employer-union health benefits trust fund from being subject to the allotment procedures under chapter 37 or the powers of the governor and director of finance under sections 37-32 through 37-41; provides each of the six trustees of the Hawaii employer-union health benefits trust fund with one vote; requires any action by the board to receive at least six votes from the trustees; clarifies that funds designated to pay trust fund benefits shall not be transferred. (CD1)
Title
Hawaii EUTF; Allotment; Trust Fund Benefits; Trustee; Vote
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Gary Hooser [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Russell Kokubun [D] |
Sen. Dwight Takamine [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] | Sen. Shan Tsutsui [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 677). | |
2010-07-06 | (H) Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 439). | |
2010-06-21 | (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-21-10 (Gov. Msg. No. 627) | |
2010-06-21 | (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 388) | |
2010-05-03 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 2 No(es): Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom. 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 153-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 153-10). | |
2010-04-23 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, Rhoads, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Takamine, Taniguchi, Kim, Kokubun; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-10 5:15PM in conference room 312. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-10 3:15PM in conference room 312. | |
2010-04-21 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-10 3:15PM in conference room 312. | |
2010-04-20 | (H) Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 624). | |
2010-04-20 | (S) Senator(s) Kokubun added as conferee(s). | |
2010-04-20 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 597). | |
2010-04-19 | (H) Re-referred to FIN, LAB, referral sheet 76 | |
2010-04-19 | (H) House conferees appointed: M. Oshiro, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Yamashita. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 534). | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 533). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Takamine, Chair; Taniguchi, Kim, Co-Chair(s); . | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Deferred until 04-08-10. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 433). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Ching, Finnegan, Marumoto, Pine, Thielen, Ward voting no (6) and Representative(s) Bertram, Hanohano excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1210-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-29 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Brower, Choy, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Coffman, Ward; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Finnegan; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Awana, Sagum. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 03-29-10 5:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-03-19 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Har, Manahan, Morita, M. Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused (8). | |
2010-03-19 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 837-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-16 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Awana, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Saiki; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hanohano, Souki; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Pine. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-16-10 10:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 36 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 292) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2589) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hee, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-10 10:20AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Reported from LBR/JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2278) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Takamine, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Hee. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Bunda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR/JGO deferred the measure until 02-09-10 3:00pm in conference room 224. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR/JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-10 9:30am in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-28 | (S) Referred to LBR/JGO, WAM. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2749 (Same As) 2010-01-27 - (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 7