HI SB2877 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 8 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 8 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that the practicum internship experience requirement is to be included with the course work in counseling requirement for mental health counselors. Clarifies that the supervised mental health practicum intern experience requirement is a total of 300 hours of supervised client contact across two academic terms. Permits applicants to fulfill all or part of their face-to-face clinical supervision requirement by a videoconference service. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Mental Health Counselors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Intrastate Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Intrastate Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2020-07-08 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 630). |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Keith-Agaran. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 07-08-20. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 07-08-20. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Deferred One Day 07-06-20. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 374). |
2020-07-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-07-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1249-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-06-29 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi. |
2020-06-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 06-29-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-06-25 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Matayoshi excused (2). |
2020-06-25 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1212-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-06-24 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Cachola, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Har, Mizuno. |
2020-06-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 06-24-20 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2020-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-17-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-03-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). |
2020-03-13 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1085-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2020-03-12 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, McDermott. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Thursday, 03-12-20 9:30AM in House conference room 430. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 412) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2902) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Fevella. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HMS, CPH. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2321 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
Subjects
License Requirement
Mental Health Counselor
Post-graduate Experience Supervision
Practicum Internship Experience
Mental Health Counselor
Post-graduate Experience Supervision
Practicum Internship Experience