HI SB2916 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 5:15pm in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 5:15pm in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires ERS to require any department or agency of the State or counties to furnish to the system certain payroll and personnel transaction information, including changes or errors in payments. Provides that if a department or agency fails to provide the information in the required format, the State or county is required to pay to the system an amount equal to the employer contributions payable by the department or agency. Provides that unpaid amounts shall bear interest. Allows ERS to waive department or agency requirements paying employer contributions due to unforeseen circumstances. Requires reporting. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB2916 HD1)
Title
Employees' Retirement System; Payroll and Personnel Transactions
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 5:15pm in conference room 325. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 4:15PM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-14 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Woodson, Fukumoto Members. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Hee Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Slom Member. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Johanson voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Oshiro excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1616-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-04-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Morikawa; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2014-04-01 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-02-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-21 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1184-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-18 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Yamashita, Aquino, Ichiyama, Takayama, Takumi, Yamane, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2014-03-17 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-18-14 10:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2014-03-07 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 329) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2783) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kouchi, Ruderman. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-14 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2441) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Ihara, Slom. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-14 10:30AM in conference room 16. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |