HI SB2951 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 680).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 680).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for fair compensation when leased public land for agricultural or pastoral uses is withdrawn, condemned, or taken for public purposes. (CD1)
Title
Leased Public Lands; Withdrawal; Compensation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 680). | |
2010-07-06 | (H) Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 442). | |
2010-06-21 | (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-21-10 (Gov. Msg. No. 627) | |
2010-06-21 | (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 388) | |
2010-05-03 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ching excused (1). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 2 No(es): Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom. 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 133-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-23 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 133-10). | |
2010-04-23 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tsuji, Har, Choy, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Kim, Kokubun, Takamine; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-23-10 11:00AM in conference room 224. | |
2010-04-21 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-10 3:30PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-04-20 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-21-10 3:30PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-04-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-20-10 2:00PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 557). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Ito, Tsuji, Har Co-Chairs; Choy, Marumoto. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 574). | |
2010-04-09 | (S) Senator(s) Kokubun added as conferee(s). | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 496). | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 494). | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Kim, Co-Chair(s); Takamine, Hemmings. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 436). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Bertram, Hanohano excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1237-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-31 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Wooley. | |
2010-03-31 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-31-10 6:00PM in conference room 308. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-03-22 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-25-10 3:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-03-19 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Har, Manahan, Morita, M. Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused (8). | |
2010-03-19 | (H) Reported from WLO/AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 890-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Wooley, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Takai, Tokioka, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Berg; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Manahan, Wakai. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Har, Chang, Chong, Coffman, Herkes, Morita, Sagum, Ching; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) C. Lee, Luke, Thielen; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla. | |
2010-03-17 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-18-10 11:30AM in conference room 325. | |
2010-03-15 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO/AGR on Monday, 03-15-10 10:30AM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Referred to WLO/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 37 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 318) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2620) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Hee, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-18-10 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2172) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Bunda, Fukunaga, Takamine, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Kokubun. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-08-10 3:15pm in conference room 229. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-10 2:45pm in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) Referred to WTL, WAM. | |
2010-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Introduced. |