HI SB2953 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:05PM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:05PM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes clarifications regarding removal of unauthorized vessels on state property or in the waters of the State. Makes clarifications regarding the definition of an abandoned vessel. Changes the time limit to claim an unauthorized vessel that is impounded by the department of land and natural resources from thirty days to ten working days. Changes the time limit to claim an abandoned vessel that is impounded by a state or county agency from twenty days to ten working days. Makes abandonment of a vessel on waters of the State or public property a petty misdemeanor. Makes clarifications to auction requirements regarding abandoned vessels. Allows DLNR to charge an impound storage fee. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Vessels.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-17-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). |
2020-03-13 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1040-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-03-11 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-11-20 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 446) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3274) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-20 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2412) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-20 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2076 (Same As) 2020-02-05 - The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Abandoned Vessels
Derelict Vessels
DLNR
Grounded Vessels
Unauthorized Vessels
Vessel Auctions
Vessel Disposal
Vessel Impoundment
Derelict Vessels
DLNR
Grounded Vessels
Unauthorized Vessels
Vessel Auctions
Vessel Disposal
Vessel Impoundment