HI SB2972 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 681).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 681).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to allocate 10 percent of revenues collected from commercial properties within the Banyan Drive redevelopment area to the Banyan Drive Hawaii Redevelopment Agency. Appropriates funds to the Agency for conducting environmental impact studies that are necessary to complete the Agency's redevelopment plan for the Banyan Drive redevelopment area. Requires matching funds from the County of Hawaii. (SB2972 HD1)
Title
Relating To Land Development.
Sponsors
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 681). |
2018-04-26 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 2:30PM in conference room 423. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-18 2:30PM in conference room 423. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; K. Kahele, K. Rhoads, Gabbard Co-Chairs; Galuteria. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Yamane, Todd Co-Chairs; Onishi, McDermott. |
2018-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 778). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 537). |
2018-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1939-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Todd, Tupola. |
2018-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-04-18 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, McKelvey, Souki, Todd, Ward excused (6). |
2018-03-21 | House | Reported from EEP/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1248-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-16 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Cullen, Kong, C. Lee, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, McKelvey. |
2018-03-16 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Cullen, Kong, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, McKelvey, McDermott. |
2018-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WAL on Friday, 03-16-18 11:01AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to EEP/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 377) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2883) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported from ETT/WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2319) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Baker. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Riviere, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT/WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-18 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to ETT/WTL/AEN, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |