HI SB2992 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Vetoed on 07-10-18 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1259).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Vetoed on 07-10-18 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1259).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts signs and banners from certain election law disclaimer requirements relating to advertisements. Requires signs and banners advocating the passage or defeat of an issue or question on the ballot to contain the name and address of the candidate, candidate committee, or noncandidate committee paying for the sign or banner. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Campaign Finance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | Senate | Vetoed on 07-10-18 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1259). |
2018-07-10 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1259). |
2018-06-25 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1155) |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-25-18 (Gov. Msg. No. 1155) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 74-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 74-18). |
2018-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-18 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 786). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Kim, K. Rhoads. |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto Chair; San Buenaventura, Thielen. |
2018-04-04 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 486). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-04-18. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-03-18. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-02-18. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Deferred One Day 03-29-18. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 393). |
2018-03-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Souki, Tokioka excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1511-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-03-14 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, McDermott. |
2018-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-14-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 36 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 383) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2590) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |