HI SB3 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 287, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1393).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for the election of the Office of Hawaiian Affairs board members through a system of nonpartisan primary and general elections to begin with the 2014 elections. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of Hawaiian Affairs; Trustees; Election

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateBecame law without the Governor's signature, Act 287, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1393).
2013-07-09HouseBecame law without the Governor's signature, Act 287, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1393).
2013-06-24SenateNotice of Intent to veto dated 06-24-13(Gov. Msg. No. 1237)
2013-06-24HouseNotice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1237)
2013-05-07SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2013-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cheape, Fale, Fukumoto voting no (3) and none excused (0).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
2013-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 15) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
2013-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 15).
2013-04-22HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Rhoads, Coffman; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2013-04-22SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Hee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom.
2013-04-18SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-13 2:00PM in conference room 312.
2013-04-17SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-13 1:30PM in conference room 312.
2013-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 698).
2013-04-16SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Galuteria, Chair; Hee, Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Ihara, Slom.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Hanohano, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Coffman, McDermott.
2013-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
2013-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2013-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 486).
2013-04-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-04-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13.
2013-04-05HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1613) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-03-28HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee.
2013-03-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-28-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2013-03-21HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-22-13 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2013-03-19HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-22-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2013-03-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2013-03-19HouseReported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1019) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2013-03-13HouseThe committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, C. Lee.
2013-03-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-13-13 9:45AM in House conference room 325.
2013-03-07HouseReferred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 30
2013-03-07HousePass First Reading
2013-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 44) in amended form (SD 1).
2013-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
2013-03-01SenateReported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 691) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2013-02-28SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-28-13 10:30AM in conference room 016.
2013-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.
2013-02-15SenateReported from THA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 373) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL.
2013-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on THA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in THA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Solomon ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Kahele, Slom.
2013-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on THA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-13 2:45PM in conference room 224.
2013-01-17SenateReferred to THA, JDL.
2013-01-17SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback