HI SB3008 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Matayoshi excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Matayoshi excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts hydrogen fuels from measurement requirements of petroleum products. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Measurement Standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Matayoshi excused (2). |
2020-06-25 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1208-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-06-24 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Cachola, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Har, Mizuno. |
2020-06-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 06-24-20 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2020-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-17-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-03-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). |
2020-03-13 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1053-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2020-03-12 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane, Thielen. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-12-20 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-03 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-02-28 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 57) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-28-20. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2968) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-20-20 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2696) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Fevella. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-20 2:50PM in conference room 414. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET, CPH. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to AEN, CPH. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |