HI SB3024 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 5:00PM in conference room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 5:00PM in conference room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allocates $3,000,000 to the Special Land and Development Fund from the Transient Accommodations Tax revenues, of which an unspecified amount will be allocated to the Conservation and Resources Enforcement Special Fund. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB3024 HD1)
Title
Transient Accommodations Tax; Special Land and Development Fund; Conservation and Resources Enforcement Special Fund; DLNR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 5:00PM in conference room 309. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 725). |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 4:30PM in conference room 312. |
2014-04-25 | House | House Conferees Changed: Representative Luke added as Co-Chair. Representative Tokioka discharged as Co-Chair. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 2:30PM in conference room 312. |
2014-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2014-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-23-14 4:30PM in conference room 312. |
2014-04-17 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-21-14 4:30PM in conference room 312. |
2014-04-15 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-17-14 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Brower, Evans, Tokioka Co-Chairs; Lowen, Fale Members. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kahele Chair; Solomon, Ige Co-Chairs; Keith-Agaran, Taniguchi Members. |
2014-04-14 | House | Re-referred to TOU, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 55 |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 644). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1570-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Ward. |
2014-03-27 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-28-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-19 | House | Re-referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 37 |
2014-03-17 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-17-14 9:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Awana, Hanohano voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Tokioka, Yamashita excused (4). |
2014-03-14 | House | Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 975-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. |
2014-03-13 | House | The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Tokioka, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Awana, Onishi, Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takai. |
2014-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Thursday, 03-13-14 9:15AM in House conference room 312. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to TOU, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 349) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2691) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-14 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Reported from TSM/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2420) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Galuteria, Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman, Taniguchi. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Ihara. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSM/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-14 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TSM/WTL, WAM. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |