HI SB3035 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, McKelvey, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, McKelvey, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the ocean sciences research tax credit. Effective 7/1/2051. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2020. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, McKelvey, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). |
2020-05-12 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1186-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-03-11 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-11-20 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 462) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3368) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-20 10:35AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2773) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET deferred the measure until 02-12-20 2:50PM in conference room 414. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-20 2:50PM in conference room 414. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |