HI SB3037 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3).
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3).
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the performance framework requirements for charter schools. Amends authorizers' reporting and audit requirements. Amends authorizers' responsibilities in reviewing charter applications. Effective 7/1/2051. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Charter Schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). |
2020-03-13 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1023-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. |
2020-03-11 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Quinlan, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno, Tarnas, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Okimoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, DeCoite. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Wednesday, 03-11-20 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to LHE, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 464) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3349) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-20 10:35AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2596) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-20 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2695 (Same As) 2020-02-11 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.