HI SB3054 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 8 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 8 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires every person who permanently moves firearms out of the State to contact the county police department where the firearms are registered to notify that police department that the firearms have been moved out of State within five days of their removal from the State. Imposes a fine of $100 per firearm for violations. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Firearm Registration.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2020-07-08 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 630). |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 20; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 2 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella, Riviere. 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Keith-Agaran. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 07-08-20. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 07-08-20. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Deferred One Day 07-06-20. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 376). |
2020-07-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Todd voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Eli, Har, Kitagawa, Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Quinlan, Say, Tokioka, Ward, Yamane voting no (13) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-06-29 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Aquino, Creagan, Hashimoto, McKelvey, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Eli, Har, Kitagawa, Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Quinlan, Say, Tokioka, Ward, Yamane voting no (13) and none excused (0). |
2020-06-29 | House | Reported from PVM/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1231-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-06-24 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Perruso, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, McKelvey; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Say, Yamane; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima. |
2020-06-24 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Kong, McDermott; and Excused: none. |
2020-06-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM/JUD on Wednesday, 06-24-20 3:02PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM/JUD on Wednesday, 03-18-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to PVM/JUD, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 471) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Fevella, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3255) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-20 10:15AM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2488) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-07-20 12:30PM in conference room 229. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-20 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |