HI SB310 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 221, 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1324).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 221, 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1324).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an assisted community treatment program in lieu of the involuntary outpatient treatment program for severely mentally ill individuals who meet specified criteria. Amends procedures for determination of order to and discharge from a treatment program. Requires an entity designated by the department of health to submit an annual report to the legislature about hospitalization of persons who are under an order for assisted community treatment. Prohibits state-operated providers from filing a petition for assisted community treatment until July 1, 2015. Allows private providers to file a petition for assisted community treatment after January 1, 2014. Allows any interested party to file a petition for assisted community treatment after January 1, 2014. Repeals on 7/1/2020. (CD1)
Title
Mental Health; Involuntary Outpatient Treatment; Assisted Community Treatment
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | Senate | Act 221, 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1324). |
2013-07-02 | House | Act 221, on 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1324). |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 77). |
2013-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 4-30-13 |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 77) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Rhoads, Jordan, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Chun Oakland, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Slom. |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 2:15PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-13 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Belatti, Aquino, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Jordan, Fukumoto. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Green, Chair; Chun Oakland, Hee, Co-Chair(s); Ihara, Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 513). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cullen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hashem, Say voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1620) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-02 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 04-02-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from HLT/PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1212) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-03-20 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Hashem, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane, McDermott. |
2013-03-20 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Jordan. |
2013-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-20-13 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2013-03-15 | House | The committee(s) on HLT/PBS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-13 at 11:30am in Room 329. |
2013-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/PBS on Friday, 03-15-13 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-03-11 | House | Re-referred to HLT/PBS, JUD, referral sheet 34 |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT, PBS, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 106) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 692) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-28-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Reported from HTH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 42) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-13 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HTH/HMS, JDL. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB991 (Same As) 2013-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).