HI SB3102 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Vetoed on 07/11/2016 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1337).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Vetoed on 07/11/2016 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1337).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DBEDT to develop, and state agencies to enter into, inter-agency agreements without entering into a memorandum of agreement or memorandum of understanding. Establishes the high-growth grant program and special fund to provide grants to qualified businesses for certain business development activities. Makes an appropriation. (CD1)
Title
Inter-agency Agreements; DBEDT; Business Development; Grant Program; Special Fund; Established; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | Senate | Vetoed on 07/11/2016 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1337). |
2016-07-11 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1337). |
2016-06-27 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1227) |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06/27/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227) |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 150-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 150-16). |
2016-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Yamashita, Kong, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Keith-Agaran, Tokuda, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 5:30PM in conference room 309. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-28-16 3:15PM in conference room 309. |
2016-04-25 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 704). |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kim Chair; Keith-Agaran, Tokuda Co-Chairs; Dela Cruz. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Kawakami, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Kong, Ward. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 607). |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1699-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-04-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-07-16 2:01PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka excused (4). |
2016-03-18 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1086-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-15 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 03-15-16 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 344) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Deferred until 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2554) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Galuteria. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-16 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported from GVO/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2430) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-17-16 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ihara, Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Slom. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/JDL added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-16-16 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to GVO/JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |