HI SB3102 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Re-Referred to LCA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Re-Referred to LCA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes the state earned income tax credit refundable and permanent. Increases and amends the refundable food/excise tax credit by basing the amount of the credit on a taxpayer's Hawaii earned income, rather than federal adjusted gross income. Increases minimum wage rate to $11.00 per hour beginning on 1/1/2021, $12.00 per hour beginning on 1/1/2022, $12.50 per hour beginning on 1/1/2023, and $13.00 per hour beginning on 1/1/2024.
Title
Relating To Helping Working Families.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2541 (Same As) 2020-05-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3102&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB3102_.HTM |