HI SB3111 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 11:30AM in conference room 423.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 11:30AM in conference room 423.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defines "alternative fuel vehicle" for the purpose of annual vehicle registration surcharge fees. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Electric Vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 11:30AM in conference room 423. |
2020-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN/EEP on Wednesday, 03-18-20 11:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to TRN/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 495) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2988) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-20 10:35AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported from TRS/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2441) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-20 1:16PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TRS/EET, WAM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |