HI SB3138 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 11:00AM in conference room 423.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 11:00AM in conference room 423.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes limit on costs eligible for exemption from general excise tax for development costs of affordable rental housing certified by the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 11:00AM in conference room 423. |
2020-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB/HSG on Tuesday, 03-17-20 11:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2020-03-12 | House | Re-referred to LAB/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 41 |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to LAB, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 502) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3312) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-20 1:40PM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2871) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 02-13-20 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-20 1:45PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |