HI SB3145 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes licensure requirements for school psychologists to be administered by the board of psychology. Amends the composition of the board to include 2 school psychologists.
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3145&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB3145_.HTM |