HI SB3148 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the government use of face surveillance except under certain circumstances. Limits the private use of face surveillance unless the subject of the face surveillance has given consent. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Face Surveillance.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-20 10:15AM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2752) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-20 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2745 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).