HI SB3151 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:05PM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:05PM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that restrooms and toilet facilities of public amusement facilities constructed, renovated, retrofitted, or installed after 1/1/2021 have 2 female-use toilets for each male-use toilet or urinal.
Title
Relating To Equal Access To Public Conveniences.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-16-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-03 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-02-28 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 59). |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-28-20. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2928) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-20 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to LCA, JDC. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |