HI SB322 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 188, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1302).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 188, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1302).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that circuit and family courts shall have concurrent jurisdiction over certain felonies under certain circumstances involving the offense of endangering the welfare of a minor in the first degree, endangering the welfare of a minor in the second degree, or endangering the welfare of an incompetent person. Provides that district and family courts shall have concurrent jurisdiction regarding the offense of endangering the welfare of a minor in the second degree and endangering the welfare of an incompetent person under certain conditions. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Court Jurisdiction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | House | Act 188, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1302). |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Act 188, 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1302). |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 66) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 66). |
2017-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Oshiro, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kim, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-17 10:20AM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 10:50AM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Kim, K. Rhoads. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto Chair; Oshiro, McDermott. |
2017-04-07 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 540). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 457). |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Say excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Quinlan excused (2). |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1571) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-03-29 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Oshiro, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, McDermott. |
2017-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-29-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 21 |
2017-02-16 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-02-15 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 8) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-15-17. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 157) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1236 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6