HI SB325 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Act 012, 04/17/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1113).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Act 012, 04/17/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1113).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that evidence relating to an alleged parent's consent to an artificial insemination procedure that resulted in the birth of a child may be introduced as evidence relating to paternity. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Parentage.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | Senate | Act 012, 04/17/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1113). |
2019-04-18 | House | Act 012, on 04/17/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1113). |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 517). |
2019-03-29 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Hashem, Say, Tokioka excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-28 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2). |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1905), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-03-15 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey. |
2019-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-15-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-14 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-15-19 at 2:00pm. |
2019-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-14-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 96) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 778) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-19 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1265 (Same As) 2019-02-08 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.