HI SB326 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB326
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the exemption of the Hawaii Public Housing Authority from certain administrative supervision by its board of directors regarding personnel matters.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Public Housing Authority.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | Senate | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-19 1:30PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB326 (Carry Over) 2019-01-29 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
HB365 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB365 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=326&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB326_.HTM |