HI SB33 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (S) The recommendation was not adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (S) The recommendation was not adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes special marine life conservation education fund for the purpose of funding public education and outreach regarding marine life conservation; clarifies that the special land and development fund may be used to fund public education regarding conservation activities; specifies that fines and fees collected for violations of marine life conservation provisions shall be deposited into the marine life conservation education fund.
Title
Conservation and Resources; Special Funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | (S) The recommendation was not adopted. | |
2011-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Ryan, Slom; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Shimabukuro, Tokuda. | |
2011-02-14 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH will hold a public decision making on 02-17-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-02-14 | (S) The committee on WLH has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 02-15-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH will hold a public decision making on 02-15-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee on WLH deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH deferred the measure until 02-10-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Referred to WLH, WAM. | |
2011-01-20 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=33 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SB33_.HTM |