HI SB332 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Act 070, 4/30/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1170).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Act 070, 4/30/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1170).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires employers to provide employees with specific wage and employer information in employees' pay records; requires employers to maintain accurate and timely wage recordkeeping. Effective January 1, 2014. (SB332 HD2)
Title
Wages; Payment of Compensation
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | Senate | Act 070, 4/30/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1170). |
2013-05-01 | House | Act 070, on 4/30/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1170). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 696). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Nakashima, Hashem Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Johanson. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-16-13. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-16-13. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 516). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1492) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen. |
2013-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-13 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1134) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-15 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamane, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 03-15-13 9:10AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-03-11 | House | Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 34 |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to EDB/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 112) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Galuteria). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 747) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Keith-Agaran. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-13 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-13 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 280) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-13 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee on JDL has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 02-08-13 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-08-13 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB59 (Same As) 2013-02-01 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.