HI SB332 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB332
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the sales of mobility enhancing equipment sold by prescription, prosthetic devices, prescription drugs sold pursuant to a prescription, diabetic supplies, medical oxygen, and human blood and its derivatives from the general excise tax for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018. Amends the definitions of "prosthetic device" and "prescription drugs".
Title
Relating To The General Excise Tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB332 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
HB632 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
HB632 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=332&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB332_.HTM |