HI SB340 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB340
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the board of education's membership by inviting the exclusive representative for bargaining unit (5) to appoint a nonvoting public school teacher representative to the board.
Title
Relating To The Board Of Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-26-19 11:30AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 59) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Kim; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB340 (Carry Over) 2019-02-26 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=340&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB340_.HTM |