HI SB341 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies exemptions from licensure as a behavioral analyst for general education teachers, direct support workers, special education teachers, and teacher trainees working in collaboration with or under the supervision of licensed professionals. Requires the DOE to seek approval by the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services to amend the Hawaii Medicaid State Plan to provide reimbursement for applied behavior analysis services. (SB341 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Related To The Practice Of Behavior Analysis.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Kanuha, Fevella.
2019-04-05HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685).
2019-04-05SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 575).
2019-04-04HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-02HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-04-19.
2019-04-02HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1935) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-28HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa.
2019-03-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-28-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-21HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
2019-03-21HouseReported from LHE/IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1544) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-03-14HouseThe committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, McDermott.
2019-03-14HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Tarnas, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Okimoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, Quinlan.
2019-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE/IAC on Thursday, 03-14-19 2:15PM in House conference room 309.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to LHE/IAC, CPC, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 103) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1010) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee on CPH has rescheduled its decision making to 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH.
2019-02-08SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 126) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH.
2019-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-19 2:55PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-22SenateReferred to EDU, CPH.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback