HI SB345 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Act 194, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1297).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Act 194, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1297).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Raises fees related to portable electronics insurance licenses to $5,000 for the issuance of the initial portable electronics limited lines licenses and $2,500 per year for the initial or renewal term. (CD1)
Title
Portable Electronics Insurance; Licensing Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | Senate | Act 194, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1297). |
2013-06-26 | House | Act 194, on 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1297). |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cheape, Fale, Fukumoto, Johanson, McDermott, Thielen, Ward voting no (7) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 2 No(es): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Slom. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 82) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 82). |
2013-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Takayama, Cachola; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cheape; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 712). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Taniguchi added as conferee(s). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Chun Oakland added as Co-Chair(s). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Ihara discharged as conferee(s). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Ige discharged as Co-Chair(s). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 10:00AM in conference room 423. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-13 10:00AM in conference room 423. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Tsuji, Takayama Co-Chairs; Cachola, Cheape. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Wakai, Chair; Baker, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Ihara, Nishihara. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 517). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Johanson voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Fukumoto, McDermott, Ward voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1618) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Woodson. |
2013-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-13 3:15PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cheape, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Johanson voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla, Fale, McDermott, Thielen, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1119), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-19 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-18 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2013-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-19-13 10:30AM in conference room 312. |
2013-03-15 | House | Re-referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 38 |
2013-03-12 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 03-12-13 10:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to EDB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 116) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 571) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported from TEC/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 290) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-13 9:50AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to TEC/CPN, WAM. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB142 (Same As) 2013-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cheape, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Johanson voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla, Fale, McDermott, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Coffman, Har, Say excused (3).