HI SB350 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB350
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Hawaii community development authority to prepare a programmatic environmental impact statement for housing development projects on all lands within the Kakaako community development district. Allows the programmatic environmental impact statement, once it is accepted by the office of environmental quality control, to satisfy the environmental assessment and impact statement requirements for any housing development project within the Kakaako community development district.
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HOU/AEN, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB350 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Subjects
Affordable Housing
Hawaii Community Development Authority
Kakaako Community Development District
Office of Environmental Quality Control
Programmatic Environmental Impact Statement
Hawaii Community Development Authority
Kakaako Community Development District
Office of Environmental Quality Control
Programmatic Environmental Impact Statement
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=350&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB350_.HTM |