HI SB351 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits advertising a public housing unit and housing subject to an owner or renter occupancy requirement under chapter 201H, Hawaii Revised Statutes, or chapter 206E, Hawaii Revised Statutes, for rental purposes and requires county police departments to enforce the prohibition. Does not apply to any state agency advertising or publicizing a housing program under chapters 201H, 206E, and 356D, Hawaii Revised Statutes. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Housing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2019-02-13SenateReported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 316) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2019-01-22SenateReferred to HOU, JDC.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback