HI SB362 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the board of education, in consultation with the department of education and the state public charter school commission, to develop a formula to determine the amount of facilities funding for charter schools. Requires that, beginning with fiscal year 2014-2015, the general fund facilities funding request for charter schools shall be based on this formula.
Title
Charter Schools; Facilities Funding
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee on EDU deferred the measure. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-13 1:30PM in conference room 414. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB347 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=362&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB362_.HTM |