HI SB362 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB362
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits any law, ordinance, or rule from imposing an inclusionary zoning requirement on housing offered exclusively for sale in perpetuity to buyers who are residents of the State, are owner-occupants, and do not own any other real property.
Title
Relating To Inclusionary Zoning.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from HOU/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 377) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Fevella. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Harimoto. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 2:45PM in conference room CR 225. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HOU/PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB362 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=362&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB362_.HTM |