HI SB365 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to TRE, JDL.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to TRE, JDL.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a limited purpose driver's license, limited purpose provisional driver's license, and limited purpose instruction permit. Defines limited purpose. Provides that limited purpose driver's licenses, limited purpose provisional driver's licenses, and limited purpose instruction permits shall not be acceptable for federal identification purposes. Requires satisfactory proof of identity and Hawaii residency. Effective 1/1/2016.
Title
Motor Vehicle Licensing; Proof of Residency; Proof of Identity; REAL ID Act of 2005
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE, JDL. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to TRA, JDL. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=365&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB365_.HTM |