HI SB365 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB365
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an investment income tax credit for energy storage property that receives, stores, and delivers energy. Requires DOTAX and DBEDT to submit annual reports to the legislature regarding the energy storage income tax credit. Requires DBEDT to complete a study on the impacts and benefits of the tax credit and its contribution to the State reaching its energy goals. Applies to taxable years after 12/31/16.
Title
Relating To Energy Storage.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-15 | Senate | The committee on TRE deferred the measure. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-15-17 2:30PM in conference room 225. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-17 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-03-17 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-17 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to TRE, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB365 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=365&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB365_.HTM |