HI SB370 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB370
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to TEC/EET, WAM.
Pending: Senate Technology and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to TEC/EET, WAM.
Pending: Senate Technology and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals Act 67, Session Laws of Hawaii 2018, relating to alternative energy research and funding. Repeals Act 141, Session Laws of Hawaii 2018, relating to the research and development program in the Hawaii technology development corporation.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Technology Development Corporation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TEC/EET, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB370 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to TEC/EET, WAM.
HB623 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
HB623 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Subjects
Alternative Energy Research
Grants
HTDC
Research and Development Program
Research and Development Special Fund
Grants
HTDC
Research and Development Program
Research and Development Special Fund
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=370&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB370_.HTM |