HI SB380 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Act 020, 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1121).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Imposes the transient accommodations tax on mandatory resort fees and requires that those fees be included in gross rental or gross rental proceeds. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Transient Accommodations Tax.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateAct 020, 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1121).
2019-04-24HouseAct 020, on 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1121).
2019-04-04SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-04-04SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 536).
2019-04-03HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) DeCoite, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Kong, Okimoto, Say, Tokioka voting no (5) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-03HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1984), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-28HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd.
2019-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-19 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-19HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3).
2019-03-19HouseReported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1427), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-12HouseThe committees on TIA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Holt, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Creagan, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, Okimoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TIA on Tuesday, 03-12-19 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 113) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, Moriwaki. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01SenateOne Day Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1060) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, Kanuha ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-15SenateReported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 651) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-19 2:50PM in conference room 414.
2019-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on EET deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-06-19 3:00PM in conference room 414.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 3:00PM in conference room 414.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to EET, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback