HI SB382 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB382
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the formula for the amount of transient accommodations tax to be collected from time shares by increasing the base on which time share occupancy is taxed from one-half of the gross daily maintenance fees paid by the owner and attributable to the time share unit to an amount equal to all of those fees. Effective 1/1/2020. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 115) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, Kim. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1177) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, Kanuha, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 420) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB382 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 27