HI SB383 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Act 270, 07/09/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1390).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Act 270, 07/09/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1390).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOE to establish a mandatory youth suicide awareness and prevention training program and model risk referral protocol, based on existing materials created by DOH, for all public schools, including charter schools. Requires charter schools to provide the training program and risk referral protocol to all school personnel who work directly with students in department schools and charter schools, respectively. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Youth Suicide Prevention.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | Senate | Act 270, 07/09/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1390). |
2019-07-12 | House | Act 270, on 07/09/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1390). |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 103) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 103). |
2019-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Mizuno, Kitagawa, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Ruderman, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 3:10PM in conference room 329. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 3:05PM in conference room 329. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 826). |
2019-04-22 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Mizuno, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Okimoto. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Ruderman, Baker, Kanuha Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2019-04-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 656). |
2019-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2116), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-29 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5). |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported from LHE/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1543) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-14 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say. |
2019-03-14 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Johanson, Quinlan. |
2019-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE/HLT on Thursday, 03-14-19 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to LHE/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 116) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from CPH/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 868) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-19 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from EDU/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 423) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/WAM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EDU/HMS, CPH/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |