HI SB385 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals defaults on student loans, student loan repayment contracts, and scholarship contracts as grounds for sanctioning professional and vocational licensees. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Professional And Vocational Licensing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 32) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 32).
2019-04-23HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Takumi, Nishimoto, Cabanilla Arakawa, D. Kobayashi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2019-04-23SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-22SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 920).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Ohno, Takumi, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Cabanilla Arakawa, D. Kobayashi, McDermott.
2019-04-05HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685).
2019-04-05SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-04SenateDeferred One Day 04-05-19.
2019-04-04SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 542).
2019-04-03HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-03HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1963), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-27HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
2019-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-22HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-22HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1595) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-19HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
2019-03-15HouseReported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1329) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-03-12HouseThe committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 03-12-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 117) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-02-28SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 753) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman, Fevella.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-31SenateRe-Referred to CPH.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to CPH/HRE, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback